VA HB1795 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0880)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0880)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Retirement System; employee who becomes member on or after July 1, 2010. Amends certain provisions of the Workforce Transition Act and retirement plans administered by the Virginia Retirement System to recognize the difference in benefits accorded a person who becomes a Virginia Retirement System member before July 1, 2010, and on or after July 1, 2010.
Title
Retirement System; difference in benefits for employee who becomes member on or after July 1, 2010.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Tata [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (14-Y 26-N) (Y: 14 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (61-Y 36-N) (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (61-Y 36-N) (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0880) | |
2011-04-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 880 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Communicated to Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (14-Y 26-N) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (61-Y 36-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (61-Y 36-N) | |
2011-04-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-29 | House: Governor's substitute printed 11105843D-H1 | |
2011-03-26 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-15 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-15 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1795ER) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-11 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-11 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-10 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-01-28 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-27 | House: Printed as engrossed 11101900D-E | |
2011-01-27 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB1795E | |
2011-01-27 | House: Amendments by Delegate Tata agreed to | |
2011-01-27 | House: Read second time | |
2011-01-26 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-24 | House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-20 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-13 | House: Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101900D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 3204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1123 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 1128 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 142.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 155.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 155.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 162 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 512.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |