VA HB1799 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Interest on fines and costs in criminal cases and traffic infractions. Eliminates the accrual of interest on any fine or costs imposed in a criminal case or in a case involving a traffic infraction. The bill provides that any such fine or costs that have accrued interest prior to July 1, 2019, shall cease to accrue interest on July 1, 2019, and such accrued interest may be waived by any court. A person who owes fines and costs on which interest has accrued may move any court in which he owes fines and costs to waive the interest that accrued on such fines and costs and shall have such interest waived for any period of incarceration.
Title
Criminal cases and traffic infractions; eliminates accrual of interest on fines and costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-25 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105724D-H1 |
2019-01-25 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-12-28 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-12-28 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100099D |