VA HB1809 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utilities; renewable energy and energy efficiency programs. Requires the State Corporation Commission to conduct annual proceedings to determine if Dominion Energy Virginia and Appalachian Power are making satisfactory efforts to meet objectives established in the 2018 Grid Transformation and Security Act with respect to solar-powered and wind-powered electric generation facilities and to energy efficiency programs. The measure includes levels of new construction of such generation facilities and of electricity consumption reductions that, if attained, will establish that satisfactory efforts are being made by the utility. The measure provides that if the Commission determines that the objectives are not being made, it is required to (i) determine the amount of investment that the utility would have had to make in order to have been found to have made satisfactory efforts to meet the objective and (ii) direct the utility to credit such amount to customers' bills.
Title
Electric utilities; renewable energy and energy efficiency programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 7-N) (Y: 3 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 7-N) |
2019-01-10 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-12-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-12-29 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103268D |