VA HB1812 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0416)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0416)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Medical Assistance Services; waiver of eligibility criteria; dependents of foreign service members. Directs the Department of Medical Assistance Services to amend eligibility criteria for the Community Living waiver and the Family and Individual Support waiver to allow the dependent of a foreign service member to maintain his position on the waiting list following a transfer of the foreign service member to an assignment outside the Commonwealth, so long as the foreign service member maintains the Commonwealth as his legal residence to which he intends to return following completion of the assignment.
Title
DMAS; waiver eligibility criteria, dependents of foreign service members.
Sponsors
Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 11-N) (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 11-N) (Y: 87 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0416) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 416 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1812ER) |
2019-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-28 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 11-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House (87-Y 11-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Printed as engrossed 19102446D-E |
2019-01-25 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1812E |
2019-01-25 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-01-25 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-22 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendments (18-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102446D |