VA HB1813 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; interdiction; possession or consumption of alcoholic beverages by interdicted persons; repeal. Repeals provisions allowing for a court to enter an order of interdiction prohibiting the sale of alcoholic beverages to any person who has (i) been convicted of driving any automobile, truck, motorcycle, engine, or train while intoxicated; (ii) shown himself to be a habitual drunkard; (iii) been found guilty of the illegal manufacture, possession, transportation, or sale of alcoholic beverages; or (iv) been found guilty of maintaining a common nuisance. The bill also repeals provisions making it a Class 1 misdemeanor for (a) any person to sell alcoholic beverages to any individual when at the time of such sale he knows or has reason to believe that the individual to whom the sale is made is interdicted, (b) any person to purchase alcoholic beverages for another person when at the time of such purchase he knows or has reason to believe that the person for whom the alcoholic beverage is purchased is interdicted, or (c) any person who has been interdicted to possess any alcoholic beverages or be drunk in public. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; possession or consumption of alcoholic beverages by interdicted persons.
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer Carroll Foy [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] | Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Michael Mullin [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101180D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308.09 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 225 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 227 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 322 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 333 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 334 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |