VA HB1820 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0212)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0212)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Land preservation tax credits. Provides that the maximum amount of credits that may be issued in any calendar year by the Department of Taxation shall be $100 million plus any previously issued credits that have been disallowed or invalidated by the Department. The bill also allows the Tax Commissioner to have a second appraisal conducted on property for which an application for the credit has been made if he provides written notice to the donor within 30 days of the application being filed, and requires that the Tax Commissioner make a final determination within 180 days of such notice. This bill incorporates
Title
Land preservation tax credit; limits maximum amount that any taxpayer may receive.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 0-N) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0212) | |
2011-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 212 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1820ER) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-16 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (85-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 11105317D-S1 (85-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1820S1 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11105317D-S1 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11105317D-S1 | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1820H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104508D-H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-04 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-02 | House: Incorporates HB1445 | |
2011-02-02 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104508D-H1 | |
2011-02-02 | House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-21 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #3 | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102387D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1445 (Similar To) 2011-01-24 - House: Incorporated by Finance (HB1820-Ware, R.L.) by voice vote