VA HB1820 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0570)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-20 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0570)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unstamped cigarettes; sale, transport, possession, etc.; penalties. Provides that it is a Class 6 felony to sell, purchase, transport, receive, or possess 500 or more packages of unstamped cigarettes and a Class 5 felony for a second offense; under current law, the threshold is 3,000 or more packages and there is no heightened penalty for a second offense. The bill also provides that it is a Class 1 misdemeanor to sell fewer than 500 packages of unstamped cigarettes; under current law the threshold is fewer than 3,000 packages and is a Class 2 misdemeanor.
Title
Cigarettes; sale, purchase, possession, etc., for purpose of evading taxes, penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Fin. (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Fin. (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0570) | |
2013-03-20 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 570 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1820ER) |
2013-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-19 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-19 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 13105165D-S1 (99-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1820S1 |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 13105165D-S1 |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 13105165D-S1 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Courts of Justice |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Rereferred from Fin. (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-01 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-29 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2013-01-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2013-01-25 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (16-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102131D |