VA HB1820 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0456)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0456)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; payment for medical services. Requires the Virginia Workers' Compensation Commission to determine the number and geographic area of communities across the Commonwealth. The measure also requires the Commission to convene a work group of stakeholder representatives of employers, health care service providers, claimants, and insurers to advise and assist the Commission in (i) reviewing, analyzing, and comparing information contained within and reports on all possible databases containing workers' compensation or health care data for medical services rendered in Virginia; (ii) reviewing, analyzing, and comparing information contained within and reports on how similar databases are used for the establishment of the pecuniary liability of the employer in other states; and (iii) making findings or recommendations as to how the databases reviewed and the contents thereof may serve to enhance or replace Virginia's current mechanisms for establishing the pecuniary liability of the employer for medical services provided to an injured employee.
Title
Workers' compensation; pecuniary liability of the employer for medical services, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0456) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 456 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1820ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-26 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-26 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 15105191D-S1 (98-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1820S1 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105191D-S1 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105191D-S1 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Assigned C&L sub: Worker's Compensation |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1820H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104477D-H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104477D-H1 |
2015-02-05 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103379D |