VA HB1820 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Passed on February 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0131)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Nondisclosure or confidentiality agreement; sexual assault; condition of employment. Prohibits an employer from requiring an employee or a prospective employee to execute or renew any provision in a nondisclosure or confidentiality agreement that has the purpose or effect of concealing the details relating to a claim of sexual assault as a condition of employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nondisclosure or confidentiality agreements; sexual assault, condition of employment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0131)
2019-02-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 131 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2019
2019-02-15HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 15, 2019
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-13HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-13HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1820ER)
2019-02-13HouseEnrolled
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-31HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1820H1
2019-01-30HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105617D-H1
2019-01-30HouseRead second time
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105617D-H1
2019-01-25HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-10HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-01HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-01HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101887D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801577(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1820
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1820+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1820H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1820ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0131+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0802V0043+HB1820
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0054+HB1820
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2061+HB1820
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0226+HB1820
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0488HB1820+HB1820
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0492HB1820+HB1820

Bill Comments

feedback