VA HB1824 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Sick leave for state employees; certain disabled veterans. Provides an additional 96 hours of sick leave to disabled veterans, defined in the bill as veterans with a disability rating by the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs of at least 60 percent, available during the 12 months following such veteran's start or return to state employment after active duty or following a disability rating decision from the U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, whichever is later. The bill provides that such additional sick leave shall be used only for the purpose of undergoing medical treatment for the service-related disability and would be provided only to those disabled veterans whose disability occurred on or after January 1, 2016.
Title
State employees; sick leave for certain disabled veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & Retirement |
2019-01-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-01 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101255D |