VA HB1828 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0211)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0211)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Rail and public transportation. Allows the purchase of land for the construction of railway lines by the Department of Rail and Public Transportation for the purpose of alleviating traffic congestion on highways.
Title
Rail transportation; DRPT to purchase land for construction of lines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 1-N) (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 1-N) (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0211) | |
2013-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 211 (effective 7/01/13) | |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1828ER) |
2013-02-14 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-21 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 1-N) |
2013-01-21 | House | Read third time and passed House (86-Y 1-N) |
2013-01-18 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-17 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-15 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101411D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 1 | 391.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 1 | 391.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |