VA HB1833 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0732)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0732)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Naloxone; administration in cases of opiate overdose. Provides that a pharmacist may dispense naloxone or other opioid antagonist used for overdose reversal pursuant to an oral, written, or standing order issued by a prescriber and in accordance with protocols developed by the Board of Pharmacy in consultation with the Board of Medicine and the Department of Health, that a person may possess and administer naloxone or other opioid antagonist used for overdose reversal to a person who is believed to be experiencing or about to experience a life-threatening opiate overdose, and that firefighters and law-enforcement officers who have completed a training program may possess and administer naloxone in accordance with protocols developed by the Board of Pharmacy in consultation with the Board of Medicine and the Department of Health. The bill also provides that a person who in good faith prescribes, dispenses, or administers naloxone or other opioid antagonist used for overdose reversal in an emergency to an individual who is believed to be experiencing or about to experience a life-threatening opioid overdose shall not be liable for any civil damages for ordinary negligence in acts or omissions resulting from the rendering of such treatment if acting in accordance with the provisions of § 54.1-3408 or in his role as a member of an emergency medical services agency. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Naloxone; administration by law-enforcement officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (1-Y 98-N) (Y: 1 N: 100 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (1-Y 98-N) (Y: 1 N: 100 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0732) | |
2015-04-15 | House | Enacted, Chapter 732 (effective 4/15/15) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1833ER2) |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2015-04-15 | Governor: Emergency clause added by Governor's recommendation | |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | House | Governor's substitute printed 15105737D-H2 |
2015-03-27 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15 |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1833ER) |
2015-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-26 | House | Conference substitute printed 15105607D-H1 |
2015-02-26 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senators: Obenshain, Reeves, Edwards |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2015-02-26 | House | Delegates: Gilbert, Habeeb, Herring |
2015-02-26 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2015-02-26 | House | House acceded to request |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (1-Y 98-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 15105278D-S1 (1-Y 98-N) |
2015-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1833S1 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105278D-S1 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105278D-S1 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Printed as engrossed 15101645D-E |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1833E |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101645D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1458 (Same As) 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0725)
SB1186 (Same As) 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0752)
SB1186 (Same As) 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0752)