VA HB1837 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Students who are eligible for free or reduced price lunch; dual enrollment; tuition or fees. Provides that no student who is eligible to receive free or reduced price lunch and who enrolls in a dual enrollment course shall be charged tuition or any other fee for such enrollment.
Title
Students; eligibility for free or reduced price lunch, dual enrollment, tuition or fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Education |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101265D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 253.13:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 907 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |