VA HB1838 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0534)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0534)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Regional Industrial Facilities Act; revenue sharing; composite index. Requires the Department of Taxation's calculation of true values as applied to the Commonwealth's composite index of local ability-to-pay to take into account an arrangement by localities entered into pursuant to the Virginia Regional Industrial Facilities Act whereby a portion of tax revenue is initially paid to one locality and redistributed to another locality. The bill requires such calculation to properly apportion the percentage of tax revenue ultimately received by each locality. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2021.
Title
Virginia Regional Industrial Facilities Act; revenue sharing, composite index.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0534) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 534 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1838ER) |
2019-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Rereferred from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2019-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101266D |