VA HB1841 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0082)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0082)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local vehicle licenses. Permits localities to issue local vehicle licenses free of charge for vehicles owned or leased by members of the Virginia Defense Force, provided that no Defense Force member shall receive more than one free license.
Title
Virginia Defense Force; issuance of local vehicle license for vehicles owned or leased by members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0082) | |
2013-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 82 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1841ER) |
2013-02-14 | House | Enrolled |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2013-01-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-22 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-21 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-18 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-17 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: #1 |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13100560D |