VA HB1841 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0517)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0517)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prescription Monitoring Program; requirements for dispensers. Requires the Department of Health Professions to register every dispenser licensed by the Board of Pharmacy with the Prescription Monitoring Program and eliminates the requirement that such registration occur upon filing of an application for licensure or renewal of a license. The bill also limits the requirement that a prescriber who prescribes benzodiazepine or an opiate request information from the Director of the Department of Health Professions to determine what other covered substances are currently prescribed to a patient in cases in which the course of treatment is anticipated at the onset of treatment to last more than 90 days. The provisions of the bill relating to registration of dispensers become effective on January 1, 2016.
Title
Prescription Monitoring Program; requirements for dispensers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0517) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 517 (effective 1/1/16 see bill) | |
2015-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/27/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1841ER) |
2015-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1841H1 |
2015-01-29 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104091D-H1 |
2015-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2015-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104091D-H1 |
2015-01-27 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101501D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2522.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2522.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2523 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |