VA HB1841 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Veteran Entrepreneurship Grant Program and Fund. Establishes the Virginia Veteran Entrepreneurship Grant Program and Fund to provide grants to eligible providers of educational, training, or other services to veterans in the areas of starting their own business, purchasing a franchise, or other entrepreneurial endeavors and to assist such service providers in offering resources to veterans for the start-up of new veteran-owned business operations in the Commonwealth. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2019, and provides that if the Program and Fund are not reauthorized by the General Assembly, moneys in the Fund shall revert to the general fund.
Title
Virginia Veteran Entrepreneurship Grant Program and Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2017-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-24 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101382D |