VA HB1841 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0417)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Pharmaceutical processors; employment; misdemeanors. Allows pharmaceutical processors to employ or permit to act as an agent of such pharmaceutical processor persons who have been convicted of certain drug and drug paraphernalia misdemeanors, except in cases where such conviction occurred within the last five years. The bill also requires that pharmaceutical processors adopt policies for pre-employment drug screening and regular, ongoing, random drug screening of employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmaceutical processors; employment, misdemeanors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 23-N) (Y: 75 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0417)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 417 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1841ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 23-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (75-Y 23-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1841H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106094D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-01HousePassed by for the day
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106094D-H1
2019-01-29HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (15-Y 7-N)
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 4-N)
2019-01-11HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-02HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-02HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102792D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5413442.6(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1841
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1841+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1841H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1841ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0417+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1202V0011+HB1841
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0063+HB1841
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2427+HB1841
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0281+HB1841
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB1841+HB1841
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0743HB1841+HB1841

Bill Comments

feedback