VA HB1842 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0761)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0761)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Performance and incentive grants. Provides (i) that no more than $20 million in Virginia Investment Performance Grants may be outstanding at any time on or after July 1, 2015, (ii) that grant payments under the Major Eligible Employer Grant Program will begin three years following approval of the employer's grant application by the Secretary of Commerce and Trade, and (iii) for the MEI Project Approval Commission to review incentive packages in which the aggregate amount of incentives offered by the Commonwealth is in excess of $10 million in value. Under current law, grant payments under the Major Eligible Employer Grant Program begin six years following approval by the Secretary of Commerce and Trade. The bill also repeals the Clean Energy Manufacturing Incentive Grant Program and the Specialized Biotechnology Research Performance Grant Program effective July 1, 2015, and the Commonwealth's semiconductor performance grant programs effective July 1, 2016.
Title
Performance and incentive grants; review of incentive packages, report, repeals certain provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendations #1, 2, 3, 9 and 10 (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (15-Y 84-N) (Y: 15 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (15-Y 84-N) (Y: 15 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0761) | |
2015-04-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 761 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-04-15 | House | Communicated to Governor |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1842ER2) |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted in-part | |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendations #1, 2, 3, 9 and 10 (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (15-Y 84-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | House rejected Governor's recommendation #'s 4, 5, 6, 7, and 8 (15-Y 84-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation #'s 1, 2, 3, 9 and 10 (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2015-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/27/15 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1842ER) |
2015-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-23 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1842H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104878D-H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104878D-H1 |
2015-02-06 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-21 | House | Assigned App. sub: Agriculture, Commerce, Technology and Natural Resources |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101383D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 5101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 5102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 5102.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |