VA HB1844 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Teacher shortages; data; task force. Requires (i) each school board to report to the Department of Education annually no later than December 31 the number of full-time teacher vacancies in the school division as of November 1, by endorsement area, and (ii) each education preparation program to report to the Department of Education annually no later than December 31 the number of individuals who graduated from the program during the current calendar year, by endorsement area. The bill requires the Department of Education to (a) aggregate and report such data to each school board and education preparation program and (b) convene a task force comprised of such stakeholders as it deems appropriate to analyze such data and recommend policies for addressing any shortage of teachers in the Commonwealth.
Title
Teachers; annual report on shortages in each school division.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Education |
2019-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100697D |