VA HB1848 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0418)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0418)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Health Professions; disclosure of investigative information. Allows the Department of Health Professions and health regulatory boards to disclose otherwise confidential information related to disciplinary hearings to the Virginia Department of Education and the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia if such information relates to nursing or nurse aide education programs regulated by the Board of Nursing.
Title
Health Professions, Department of; disclosure of investigative information.
Sponsors
Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Debra Rodman [D] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0418) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 418 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1848ER) |
2019-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-21 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-17 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-15 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101779D |