VA HB1856 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Control of firearms; libraries owned or operated by localities. Allows a locality to adopt an ordinance that prohibits firearms, ammunition, or components or a combination thereof in libraries owned or operated by the locality.
Title
Firearms; libraries owned or operated by localities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2019-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2019-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101207D |