VA HB1858 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Grocery Investment Program and Fund. Creates the Virginia Grocery Investment Program and Fund to provide funding for the construction, rehabilitation, equipment upgrades, or expansion of grocery stores, small food retailers, and innovative food retail projects, defined in the bill, in underserved communities.
Title
Virginia Grocery Investment Program and Fund; created, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources & Technology |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101209D |