VA HB1860 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; nonpayment of rent; written notice of termination; time period. Changes from five to 14 days the period within which a tenant is required to pay rent after written notice of termination of the rental agreement is served by the landlord on the tenant.
Title
Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; nonpayment of rent, written notice of termination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 5-N) (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in General Laws |
2019-01-17 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101310D |