VA HB1861 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Expungement of police and court records; misdemeanor and nonviolent felony convictions. Allows a person convicted of a misdemeanor or nonviolent felony to file a petition requesting expungement of the police and court records relating to the conviction if such person has (i) been free from any term of incarceration, probation, and postrelease supervision imposed as a result of such conviction for at least eight years, (ii) no prior or subsequent convictions other than traffic infractions, and (iii) no pending criminal proceeding.
Title
Police & court records; expungement of records relating to misdemeanor/nonviolent felony conviction.
Sponsors
Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Sen. Lashrecse Aird [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D] |
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Del. Debra Rodman [D] | Del. Mark Sickles [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102019D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 392.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 392.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |