VA HB1862 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Employment; break and location to express breast milk. Requires employers, including the Commonwealth and its political subdivisions, to provide reasonable unpaid break time each day to an employee who needs to express breast milk for her nursing child for one year after the child's birth. The bill requires an employer to make reasonable efforts to provide a room or other location, other than a bathroom, where the employee can express breast milk in privacy. An employer shall not be held to have violated these requirements if it has made reasonable efforts to comply with them. The measure applies to employees who are exempt under §7 of the federal Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA). The FLSA requires employers to provide such benefits for nonexempt employees.
Title
Employees; break time and location to express breast milk.
Sponsors
Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Karrie Delaney [D] |
Del. James Edmunds [R] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Michael Mullin [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Debra Rodman [D] | Sen. Danica Roem [D] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Del. Cheryl Turpin [D] | Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-10 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102344D |