VA HB1863 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Abortion; informed written consent. Repeals the statutory requirements that a physician obtain a pregnant woman's informed written consent and perform fetal transabdominal ultrasound imaging before performing an abortion.
Title
Abortion; informed written consent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101435D |