VA HB1868 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0784)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0784)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Adult adopted person; access to identifying information. Requires the State Registrar of Vital Records to mail an adult adopted person's original certificate of birth to him upon order of the Commissioner of Social Services or order of a circuit court. This bill also provides that if a circuit court corrects or establishes a date of birth for a person born in a foreign country during an adoption proceeding or upon a petition to amend a certificate of foreign birth, the State Registrar shall issue a certificate of birth showing the date of birth established by the court.
Title
Adult adopted person; access to identifying information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0784) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Enacted, Chapter 784 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB1868ER2) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-22 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1868ER) | |
2011-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-23 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-23 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-04 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-04 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-03 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1868H1 | |
2011-02-03 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11105005D-H1 | |
2011-02-03 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-02 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-01 | House: Committee substitute printed 11105005D-H1 | |
2011-02-01 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #3 | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101503D |