VA HB1873 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
School resource officers and school security officers; data. Requires (i) each local school board to annually collect and report to the Virginia Center for School and Campus Safety (the Center) and the Department of Education (the Department) data on the use of force against students, arrests of students, student referrals to court, and other disciplinary actions by school resource officers and school security officers and (ii) the Center, in conjunction with the Department, to collect, analyze, and disseminate such data.
Title
School resource officers and school security officers; data on use of force against students, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102775D |