VA HB1879 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Coal tax credits. Limits the aggregate amount of credits that may be allocated or claimed for the coal employment and production incentive tax credit to $7.5 million. An electricity generator must file an application with the Department of Taxation each year to determine the amount of credits that it may claim or allocate, including credits earned in prior taxable years. If the total amount of credits earned in a taxable year exceeds $7.5 million, the Department of Taxation shall apportion the credits on a pro rata basis. The bill also extends the sunset date of the coalfield employment enhancement tax credit through taxable year 2019.
Title
Coalfield employment enhancement; coal tax credits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (23-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ENROLLED FORM (67-Y 31-N 1-A) (Y: 69 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (29-Y 67-N 1-A) (Y: 29 N: 69 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (62-Y 30-N 2-A) (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 14-N) (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 14-N 1-A) (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 29-N 1-A) (Y: 71 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (32-Y 61-N) (Y: 32 N: 63 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ENROLLED FORM (67-Y 31-N 1-A) (Y: 69 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (29-Y 67-N 1-A) (Y: 29 N: 69 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (62-Y 30-N 2-A) (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 14-N) (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 14-N 1-A) (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 29-N 1-A) (Y: 71 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (32-Y 61-N) (Y: 32 N: 63 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 6-N) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 3-N) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2015-04-16 | House | Communicated to Governor |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Requires 27 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (23-Y 16-N) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: ENROLLED FORM (67-Y 31-N 1-A) |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed in enrolled form (67-Y 31-N 1-A) |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (29-Y 67-N 1-A) |
2015-04-15 | House | House rejected Governor's recommendation (29-Y 67-N 1-N) |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2015-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/25/15 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1879ER) |
2015-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-18 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (62-Y 30-N 2-A) |
2015-02-18 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 15105125D-S1 (62-Y 30-N 2-A) |
2015-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 14-N) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 14-N 1-A) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1879S1 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15105125D-S1 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15105125D-S1 |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-10 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 29-N 1-A) |
2015-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (69-Y 29-N 1-A) |
2015-02-09 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB1879H3 |
2015-02-09 | House | Substitute by Delegate Kilgore agreed to 15104764D-H3 |
2015-02-09 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (32-Y 61-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Substitute by Delegate Toscano rejected 15104942D-H2 (32-Y 61-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee substitute rejected 15104738D-H1 |
2015-02-09 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-09 | House | Floor substitute printed 15104764D-H3 (Kilgore) |
2015-02-09 | House | Floor substitute printed 15104942D-H2 (Toscano) |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104738D-H1 |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 6-N) |
2015-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 3-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101526D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1161 (Same As) 2015-04-30 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor