VA HB1881 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0577)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Public schools; instruction on the risks of certain nicotine products. Requires the Virginia Foundation for Healthy Youth to develop and the Department of Education to distribute to each local school division educational materials concerning the health and safety risks of using tobacco products, nicotine vapor products, and alternative nicotine products. The bill requires instruction concerning the health and safety risks of using such products be provided in each public elementary and secondary school in the Commonwealth, consistent with such educational materials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public schools; instruction on the hazards of nicotine vapor products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0577)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 577 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1881ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1881H2
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute from Appropriations agreed to 19106156D-H2
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute from Education rejected 19104685D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106156D-H2
2019-02-01HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HouseAssigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
2019-01-28HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 19104685D-H1
2019-01-28HouseReported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 0-N)
2019-01-11HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-03HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-01-03HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101733D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221206(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1881
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1881+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1881H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1881H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1881ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0577+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0902V0010+HB1881
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H09V0053+HB1881
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0203V0016+HB1881
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0049+HB1881
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2353+HB1881
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0248+HB1881
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB1881+HB1881
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0743HB1881+HB1881

Bill Comments

feedback