VA HB1884 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0303)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Visitors at state correctional facilities; wearing of tampons or menstrual cups. Directs the Director of the Department of Corrections to review the Department's visitation policies concerning visitors' wearing of tampons or menstrual cups at state correctional facilities and shall revise such policies as necessary to permit such visitors to wear tampons or menstrual cups. The bill directs the Department to make the policy available to the public as soon as practicable and to provide a copy to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety and the Senate Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services by November 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State correctional facilities; visitors wearing tampons or menstrual cups.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N) (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0303)
2019-03-08 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 303 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1884ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-19SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-19SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-19SenateRead third time
2019-02-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-10SenateAssigned Rehab sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (95-Y 3-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-01HousePassed by for the day
2019-01-31HousePassed by for the day
2019-01-31HouseCommittee substitute rejected 19105835D-H1
2019-01-31HouseRead second time
2019-01-30HousePassed by for the day
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105835D-H1
2019-01-25HouseReported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (19-Y 1-N)
2019-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-03HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2019-01-03HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100617D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1884
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1884+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1884H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1884ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0303+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1502V0007+HB1884
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H15V0012+HB1884
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2425+HB1884
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0098+HB1884
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0772HB1884+HB1884
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0822HB1884+HB1884
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3165+HB1884

Bill Comments

feedback