VA HB1892 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity; small business procurement enhancement program. Establishes a small business procurement enhancement program (the Program) with a statewide goal of 42 percent of small business utilization in all discretionary spending by state agencies in procurement orders, prime contracts, and subcontracts. In addition, the bill (i) provides for a small business set-aside for competition among all small businesses for state agency purchases up to $100,000 for goods and nonprofessional services and up to $50,000 for professional services and (ii) establishes qualification criteria for participation in the Program by business operations on the basis of the total number of employees or annual gross receipts, averaged over the previous three years.
Title
Small business procurement enhancement program; established, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in General Laws |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2019-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100764D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 1604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1618 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1623 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4310.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4343 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |