VA HB1899 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Concealed handgun permits; demonstration of competence. Removes the option for concealed handgun permit applicants to demonstrate competence with a handgun by completing an electronic, video, or online course conducted by a state-certified or National Rifle Association-certified firearms instructor. The bill does not affect any in-person means of satisfying the requirement to demonstrate competence with a handgun under current law.
Title
Concealed handgun permits; demonstration of competence.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bell [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2019-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102207D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.06 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |