VA HB1906 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Residential automatic pesticide misting systems; prohibition; civil penalties. Prohibits, beginning January 1, 2020, the installation or use of any residential automatic pesticide misting system, defined in the bill as a device that is designed to be installed on the grounds or the exterior of a residential dwelling and to automatically spray a pesticide solution at timed intervals. The bill authorizes the Board of Agriculture and Consumer Services to assess a penalty for each day of violation and to adopt regulations to carry out the provisions of the bill.
Title
Residential automatic pesticide misting systems; prohibition, civil penalties.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-09 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100275D |