VA HB1908 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0735)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0735)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; powdered or crystalline alcohol; penalty. Adds powdered or crystalline alcohol to the definition of alcoholic beverages, prohibits containers sold in or shipped into the Commonwealth from including powdered or crystalline alcohol, and creates a Class 1 misdemeanor for anyone who purchases, possesses, offers for sale or use, sells, or uses a powdered or crystalline alcohol product.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; adds powdered or crystalline alcohol, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0735) | |
2015-04-15 | House | Enacted, Chapter 735 (effective 4/15/15) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB1908ER2) |
2015-04-15 | House | Reenrolled |
2015-04-15 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2015-04-15 | Governor: Emergency clause added by Governor's recommendation | |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-27 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1908ER) |
2015-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (10-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-03 | House | Printed as engrossed 15102318D-E |
2015-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1908E |
2015-02-03 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-29 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (20-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102318D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1034 (Same As) 2015-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0025)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 302.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |