VA HB1909 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0008)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0008)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Habeas corpus. Reorganizes, updates outdated language, and removes unused provisions in several writ of habeas corpus statutes. The bill clarifies certain procedural issues such as service, venue, amendments for failure to name a proper party respondent, necessity of a response, and transfer for evidentiary hearings. This bill is a recommendation of the Judicial Council. This bill is identical to SB 1069.
Title
Habeas corpus; reorganizes, updates outdated language, and removes unused provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0008) | |
2019-02-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 8 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 13, 2019 | |
2019-02-06 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 6, 2019 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1909ER) |
2019-02-05 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-21 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101170D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 01 | 654 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 656 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 657 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 658 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 659 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 662 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |