VA HB1911 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0787)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0787)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Video-monitoring system; school bus violations. Authorizes localities to adopt ordinances to allow local school divisions to install and operate video-monitoring systems on school buses in order to detect drivers passing stopped school buses.
Title
School buses; installation of video-monitoring systems thereon by school divisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 1-N) (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 95-N) (Y: 2 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 1-N) (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 95-N) (Y: 2 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0787) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Enacted, Chapter 787 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB1911ER2) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 1-N) | |
2011-04-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1911ER) | |
2011-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-26 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-26 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (89-Y 1-N) | |
2011-02-26 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-26 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2011-02-26 | House: Conference substitute printed 11105655D-H2 | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Senators: Howell, Blevins, Miller, J.C. | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2011-02-24 | House: Delegates: Miller, J.H., Bell, R.B., Phillips | |
2011-02-24 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2011-02-24 | House: House acceded to request | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Senate requested conference committee | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-23 | House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 95-N) | |
2011-02-23 | House: Senate substitute rejected by House 11105464D-S1 (2-Y 95-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1911S1 | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11105464D-S1 | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11105464D-S1 | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1911H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11105112D-H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-04 | House: Committee substitute printed 11105112D-H1 | |
2011-02-04 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) | |
2011-01-14 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102581D |
Same As/Similar To
SB946 (Same As) 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0838)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 844 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 844.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |