VA HB1918 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0695)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0695)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Corrections; minimum standards for health care services in local correctional facilities. Authorizes the Board of Corrections (Board) to establish minimum standards for health care services in local, regional, and community correctional facilities and procedures for enforcing such minimum standards, with the advice of and guidance from the Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services and State Health Commissioner. The bill provides that (i) such standards shall require that each local, regional, and community correctional facility submit a standardized quarterly continuous improvement report documenting the delivery of health care services, along with any improvements made to those services, to the Board and (ii) such reports shall be available to the public on the Board's website. The bill also authorizes the Board to determine that a local, regional, or community correctional facility accredited by the American Correctional Association or National Commission on Correctional Health Care meets such minimum standards solely on the basis of such accreditation; however, without exception, the requirement to submit standardized quarterly continuous quality improvement reports shall be a mandatory minimum standard. This bill is a recommendation of the Joint Commission on Health Care. This bill is identical to SB 1598.
Title
Corrections, Board of; minimum standards for health care services in local correctional facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0695) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 695 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1918ER) |
2019-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senators: Dunnavant, Chafin, Mason |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-19 | House | Delegates: Stolle, Orrock, Aird |
2019-02-19 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-19 | House | House acceded to request |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) |
2019-02-14 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 19106616D-S1 (0-Y 98-N) |
2019-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1918S1 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106616D-S1 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106616D-S1 |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-29 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101423D |