VA HB1919 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Dual Enrollment Faculty Credential Grant Fund and Program established. Establishes the Dual Enrollment Faculty Credential Grant Fund and Program for the purpose of awarding grants on a competitive basis to school boards to assist high school teachers employed in the local school division to obtain the credentials necessary to be considered faculty who are qualified to teach dual enrollment courses in high schools in the local school division. The bill requires the Department of Education to administer the Dual Enrollment Faculty Credential Grant Program (the Program) and establish such guidelines and procedures as it deems necessary for the administration of the Program, including guidelines and procedures for grant applications, awards, and renewals.
Title
Dual Enrollment Faculty Credential Grant Fund and Program; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2019-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102006D |