VA HB1922 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0132)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Summons for unlawful detainer; initial hearing; subsequent filings; termination notice. Provides that if an initial hearing on a summons for unlawful detainer cannot be held within 21 days from the date of filing, it shall be held as soon as practicable, but not later than 30 days after the date of the filing. The bill further provides that an order of possession for the premises in an unlawful detainer action shall not be entered unless the plaintiff or the plaintiff's attorney or agent has presented a copy of a proper termination notice that the court admits into evidence. The bill allows a plaintiff to amend the amount alleged to be due and owing in an unlawful detainer action to request all amounts due and owing as of the date of a hearing on the action and to further amend such an amount to include additional amounts that become due and owing prior to the final disposition of a pending unlawful detainer action. The bill prohibits a plaintiff from filing a subsequent and additional unlawful detainer summons for such additional amounts and is identical to SB 1627.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Summons for unlawful detainer; initial hearing, subsequent filings, termination notice.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0132)
2019-02-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 132 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2019
2019-02-15HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 15, 2019
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-13HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-13HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1922ER)
2019-02-13HouseEnrolled
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-29HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1922H1
2019-01-28HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19104793D-H1
2019-01-28HouseRead second time
2019-01-25HousePassed by for the day
2019-01-24HousePassed by for the day
2019-01-23HouseRead first time
2019-01-21HouseCommittee substitute printed 19104793D-H1
2019-01-21HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-10HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-04HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101387D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801126(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1922
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1922+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1922H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1922ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0132+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0802V0011+HB1922
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0036+HB1922
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1932+HB1922
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0205+HB1922
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0488HB1922+HB1922
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0492HB1922+HB1922

Bill Comments

feedback