VA HB1923 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0324)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; noncompliance with rental agreement; tenant's right to reasonable attorney fees. Provides that a tenant is entitled to reasonable attorney fees when a tenant successfully raises as a defense the landlord's noncompliance with the rental agreement and the court enters judgment in favor of the tenant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; noncompliance with rental agreement, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0324)
2019-03-08 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 324 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1923ER)
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1923H1
2019-01-29HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105504D-H1
2019-01-29HouseRead second time
2019-01-28HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105504D-H1
2019-01-24HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-04HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-01-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101389D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1923
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1923+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1923H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1923ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0324+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1102V0015+HB1923
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0062+HB1923
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1964+HB1923
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2010+HB1923
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0127+HB1923
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB1923+HB1923
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0633HB1923+HB1923

Bill Comments

feedback