VA HB1924 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0519)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Summons to compel attendance before commissioner of another state. Removes the authorization of a summons to compel attendance of a citizen of the Commonwealth before commissioners or other persons appointed by authority of another state when the summons requires the attendance of such witness at a place not out of his county or city. This bill is a recommendation of the Boyd-Graves Conference.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Summons; attendance before commissions of another state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0519)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 519 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1924ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateReported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-29HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-25HousePassed by for the day
2019-01-24HousePassed by for the day
2019-01-23HouseRead first time
2019-01-21HouseReported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-10HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-04HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103214D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801407(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback