VA HB1925 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0464)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0464)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Assumed or fictitious name certificates. Conforms January 1, 2020, as the date when certificates of assumed or fictitious name are to be filed centrally with the clerk of the State Corporation Commission rather than with the clerk of court. A provision of existing law provides that central filing of such certificates is scheduled to commence May 1, 2019. Changing that date from May 1, 2019, to January 1, 2020, will conform the commencement of central filing to the date set by legislation enacted in the 2018 Session of the General Assembly. The measure has an emergency clause.
Title
Assumed/fictitious name certificate; conforms 1/1/2020 as date where certificates are to be filed.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0464) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 464 (effective 3/18/19) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1925ER) |
2019-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-16 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-14 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-10 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/09/19 19101897D |