VA HB1928 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Renewable energy power purchase agreements; pilot programs. Increases the aggregated capacity of all solar-powered or wind-powered generation facilities that are subject to third party power purchase agreements from 50 megawatts to 150 megawatts in Dominion Energy's pilot program and from seven to 21 megawatts in Appalachian Power's pilot program. The measure allows any public or private elementary or secondary school or any public or private institution of higher education to participate in Appalachian Power's pilot program; currently only nonprofit, private institutions of higher education may do so. The measure increases the maximum generation capacity of an eligible solar-powered or wind-powered generation facility from one megawatt to three megawatts. The measure also requires the State Corporation Commission to update its guidelines for the pilot program and repeals the sunset clause applicable to the pilot program in effect for Dominion Energy.
Title
Renewable energy power purchase agreements; pilot programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N) (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N) |
2019-01-10 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103684D |