VA HB1934 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0248)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0248)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Electric vehicle charging stations; operation by certain state agencies. Authorizes the Department of General Services, Department of Motor Vehicles, and Department of Transportation to locate and operate a retail fee-based electric vehicle charging station on property the agency controls if the electric vehicle charging services are offered at prevailing market rates, as defined in the bill. The bill exempts such agencies from being considered a public utility solely because of the sale of electric vehicle charging service or the ownership or operation of an electric vehicle charging station and further exempts such service from constituting the retail sale of electricity. Currently, such provisions are applicable only to the Department of Conservation and Recreation when operating a retail fee-based electric vehicle charging station on property of any existing state park or similar recreational facility the Department of Conservation and Recreation controls.
Title
Electric vehicle charging stations; operation by certain state agencies.
Sponsors
Del. David Bulova [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] | Del. Timothy Hugo [R] |
Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. David Toscano [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (66-Y 34-N) (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 30-N) (Y: 69 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 30-N) (Y: 69 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0248) | |
2019-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 248 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1934ER) |
2019-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (66-Y 34-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 19107270D-S1 (66-Y 34-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (31-Y 9-N) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1934S1 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19107270D-S1 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19107270D-S1 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (10-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 30-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (69-Y 30-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1934H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19105061D-H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Appropriations (18-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Assigned App. sub: General Government & Capital Outlay |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105061D-H1 |
2019-01-24 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102541D |