VA HB1936 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0329)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Public institutions of higher education; in-state tuition; foreign service officers. Provides that members of the foreign service office who resided in the Commonwealth for at least 90 days immediately prior to receiving a foreign service assignment and who continue to be assigned overseas, and any dependents of such member, are eligible for in-state tuition charges regardless of domicile.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher educational institutions, public; in-state tuition, foreign service officer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0329)
2019-03-08 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 329 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-27 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-27HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1936ER)
2019-02-20HouseEnrolled
2019-02-15SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15SenateRead third time
2019-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-07SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-30SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-29HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1936H1
2019-01-28HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105222D-H1
2019-01-28HouseRead second time
2019-01-25HouseRead first time
2019-01-23HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105222D-H1
2019-01-23HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-11HouseAssigned App. sub: Higher Education
2019-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100104D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231504(n/a)See Bill Text
231505(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1936
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1936+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1936H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1936ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0329+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0206V0002+HB1936
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0009+HB1936
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1939+HB1936
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0221+HB1936
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0358+HB1936
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0662HB1936+HB1936
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0706HB1936+HB1936

Bill Comments

feedback