VA HB1939 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0697)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation; adjustment of fees by regulatory boards; distribution of excess fees to regulants. Provides that following the close of any biennium, when the account for any regulatory board within the Department of Professional and Occupational Regulation shows that unspent and unencumbered revenue exceeds $100,000 or 20 percent of the total expenses allocated to the regulatory board for the past biennium, whichever is greater, the regulatory board must (i) distribute all such excess revenue to current regulants and (ii) reduce the fees levied by it for certification, licensure, registration, or permit and renewal thereof so that the fees are sufficient but not excessive to cover expenses. Under current law, these boards are required to adjust their fees when their account shows expenses allocated to it for the past biennium to be more than 10 percent greater or less than moneys collected on behalf of the board. Current law does not require the boards to distribute excess funds to regulants. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulatory boards; adjustment of fees, distribution of excess fees to regulants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 1-N) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0697)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 697 (effective 1/1/22)
2019-02-19 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019
2019-02-15SenateSigned by President
2019-02-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-15HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1939ER)
2019-02-15HouseEnrolled
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 1-N)
2019-02-13HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (92-Y 1-N)
2019-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-13SenatePassed Senate with amendments (36-Y 2-N)
2019-02-13SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-13SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-13SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-02-13SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (14-Y 1-N)
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N)
2019-02-01HousePrinted as engrossed 19101681D-E
2019-02-01HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1939E
2019-02-01HouseAmendments by Delegate Webert agreed to
2019-02-01HouseRead second time
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101681D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
541113(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1939
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1939+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1939E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1939ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0697+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1101V0014+HB1939
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1101V0020+HB1939
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0080+HB1939
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2205+HB1939
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0118+HB1939
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB1939+HB1939
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0551HB1939+HB1939
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2802+HB1939

Bill Comments

feedback