VA HB1940 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0003)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0003)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Child Pornography Registry; contents of Registry; criminal investigations; report. Requires copies of all known or suspected child pornography found during the course of a criminal investigation of child pornography offenses to be included in the Child Pornography Registry (the Registry). Current law provides that only such images that are presented as evidence and used in a conviction for child pornography offenses are required to be included in the Registry. The bill also provides that Registry information may be used for victim identification. The bill requires the Department of State Police, in consultation with the Office of the Attorney General, to submit a report detailing the implementation plan for changes to the Registry pursuant to the bill to the Secretary of Public Safety and Homeland Security and the Chairmen of the House Committee on Appropriations and Senate Committee on Finance by January 1, 2020. This bill is identical to SB 1379.
Title
Child Pornography Registry; contents of Registry, criminal investigations, report.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0003) | |
2019-02-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 3 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 14, 2019 | |
2019-02-07 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 7, 2019 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1940ER) |
2019-02-06 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-21 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102421D |