VA HB1942 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0827)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Behavioral health services; exchange of medical and mental health information and records; correctional facilities. Authorizes the State Board of Corrections (the Board) to establish minimum standards for behavioral health services in local correctional facilities, including (i) requirements for behavioral health screening and assessment for all individuals committed to local correctional facilities, the delivery of behavioral health services in local correctional facilities, and the sharing of medical and mental health information and records concerning individuals committed to local correctional facilities; (ii) requirements for discharge planning for individuals with serious mental illness assessed as requiring behavioral health services upon release from local correctional facilities; (iii) requirements for at least one unannounced annual inspection of each local correctional facility to determine compliance; and (iv) provisions for billing the sheriff in charge of a local correctional facility or superintendent of a regional correctional facility by a community services board that provides behavioral health services in the local or regional correctional facility. The bill also allows the person in charge of a state, regional, or local correctional facility, or his designee, to receive from a health care provider medical and mental health information and records concerning a person committed to such correctional facility, even when such committed person does not provide consent or consent is not readily obtainable, when such information and records are necessary (a) for the provision of health care to the person committed, (b) to protect the health and safety of the person committed or other residents or staff of the facility, or (c) to maintain the security and safety of the facility. The bill clarifies that the administrative personnel of a state, regional, or local correctional facility may receive medical and mental health information and records from any health care provider concerning any person committed to such correctional facility as necessary to maintain the safety of the facility, its employees, or other prisoners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Behavioral health services; exchange of medical and mental health information and records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0827)
2019-04-03HouseEnacted, Chapter 827 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-04-03SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2019-04-03HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2019-04-03HouseReenrolled bill text (HB1942ER2)
2019-04-03HouseReenrolled
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2019-04-03SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-22HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1942ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-15SenatePassed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-15SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-15SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-02-15SenateRead third time
2019-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateReported from Finance (12-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-08SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1942H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105347D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseReported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105347D-H1
2019-01-29HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-11HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103028D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
531133.03(n/a)See Bill Text
53140.10(n/a)See Bill Text
53168(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1942
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1942+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1942H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1942ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1942ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0827+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1202V0023+HB1942
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0066+HB1942
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0205V0023+HB1942
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0056+HB1942
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2461+HB1942
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0071+HB1942
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0338+HB1942
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0662HB1942+HB1942
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0706HB1942+HB1942
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3051+HB1942
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3379+HB1942
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1167HB1942+HB1942

Bill Comments

feedback